House
|
06/06/2018
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2018
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2018
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2018
|
Special Act 18-9
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
House Calendar Number 580
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2018
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5479
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2018
|
File Number 629
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2018
|
Senate Calendar Number 390
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2018
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2018
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/18 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2018
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2018
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2018
|
Public Hearing 04/02
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2018
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|