Connecticut 2018 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00538 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 538
22 February Session, 2018 LCO No. 3212
33 *03212_______FIN*
44 Referred to Committee on FINANCE, REVENUE AND BONDING
55 Introduced by:
66 (FIN)
77
88 General Assembly
99
1010 Raised Bill No. 538
1111
1212 February Session, 2018
1313
1414 LCO No. 3212
1515
1616 *03212_______FIN*
1717
1818 Referred to Committee on FINANCE, REVENUE AND BONDING
1919
2020 Introduced by:
2121
2222 (FIN)
2323
2424 AN ACT ESTABLISHING AN OFFICE OF REGIONAL EFFICIENCY DEVELOPMENT.
2525
2626 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
2727
2828 Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2018) (a) There is established an Office of Regional Efficiency Development to oversee and coordinate the delivery of regional services to municipalities. Said office shall be within the Office of Policy and Management for administrative purposes only. The Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management shall hire or assign sufficient staff for the Office of Regional Efficiency Development such that each region of the state is assigned at least one administrator and one staff person.
2929
3030 (b) The Office of Regional Efficiency Development shall identify municipal services that would be more efficiently delivered on a regional, rather than municipal, basis and would result in measurable reductions in property tax and improvements in service. Such services shall include, but not be limited to, emergency dispatch, property tax assessment and collection and administrative office functions. Said office shall develop, in consultation with municipal and regional stakeholders, short-term and long-term plans for such regional services identified and shall implement such plans.
3131
3232 Sec. 2. Section 4-66k of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2018):
3333
3434 [(a)] There is established an account to be known as the "regional planning incentive account" which shall be a separate, nonlapsing account within the General Fund. The account shall contain any moneys required by law to be deposited in the account. Moneys in the account shall be expended by the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management [in accordance with subsection (b) of this section for the purposes of first providing funding to regional planning organizations in accordance with the provisions of subsections (b) and (c) of this section and then to providing grants under the regional performance incentive program established pursuant to section 4-124s] for the purposes of the Office of Regional Efficiency Development established pursuant to section 1 of this act.
3535
3636 [(b) For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2014, funds from the regional planning incentive account shall be distributed to each regional planning organization, as defined in section 4-124i, revision of 1958, revised to January 1, 2013, in the amount of one hundred twenty-five thousand dollars. Any regional council of governments that is comprised of any two or more regional planning organizations that voluntarily consolidate on or before December 31, 2013, shall receive an additional payment in an amount equal to the amount the regional planning organizations would have received if such regional planning organizations had not voluntarily consolidated.
3737
3838 (c) Beginning in the fiscal year ending June 30, 2015, and annually thereafter, funds from the regional planning incentive account shall be distributed to each regional council of governments formed pursuant to section 4-124j, in the amount of one hundred twenty-five thousand dollars plus fifty cents per capita, using population information from the most recent federal decennial census. Any regional council of governments that is comprised of any two or more regional planning organizations, as defined in section 4-124i, revision of 1958, revised to January 1, 2013, that voluntarily consolidated on or before December 31, 2013, shall receive a payment in the amount of one hundred twenty-five thousand dollars for each such regional planning organization that voluntarily consolidated on or before said date.]
3939
4040
4141
4242
4343 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
4444 Section 1 July 1, 2018 New section
4545 Sec. 2 July 1, 2018 4-66k
4646
4747 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
4848
4949 Section 1
5050
5151 July 1, 2018
5252
5353 New section
5454
5555 Sec. 2
5656
5757 July 1, 2018
5858
5959 4-66k
6060
6161 Statement of Purpose:
6262
6363 To establish an Office of Regional Efficiency Development to identify and improve the delivery of municipal services on a regional basis.
6464
6565 [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]