House | 04/30/2018 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 04/30/2018 | Adopted, House | ||
House | 04/12/2018 | House Calendar Number 279 | ||
House | 04/12/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/11/2018 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House | ||
Senate | 04/11/2018 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2018 | Adopted, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/01/2018 | Senate Calendar Number 28 | ||
Senate | 03/01/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 02/27/2018 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2018 | Nomination Referred to Committee on Judiciary |