House | 04/18/2018 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 04/18/2018 | Adopted, House | ||
House | 04/12/2018 | House Calendar Number 285 | ||
House | 04/12/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/11/2018 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House | ||
Senate | 04/11/2018 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2018 | Adopted, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/02/2018 | Senate Calendar Number 33 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/01/2018 | Public Hearing 03/01 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2018 | Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations |