Senate | 04/24/2018 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 04/24/2018 | Adopted, House | ||
Senate | 04/19/2018 | House Calendar Number 413 | ||
Senate | 04/19/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/18/2018 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2018 | Adopted, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/13/2018 | Senate Calendar Number 312 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/05/2018 | Public Hearing 04/12 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2018 | Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations |