House | 05/03/2018 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/03/2018 | Adopted, House | ||
House | 05/01/2018 | House Calendar Number 476 | ||
House | 05/01/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/01/2018 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House | ||
Senate | 05/01/2018 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2018 | Adopted, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/24/2018 | Senate Calendar Number 407 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/23/2018 | Public Hearing 04/23 | ||
Senate | 04/16/2018 | Nomination Referred to Committee on Judiciary |