Senate | 03/20/2018 | File Number 27 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2018 | Senate Calendar Number 58 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/20/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/14/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/18 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/12/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/09/2018 | Senate Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/26/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/20/2018 | Filed with Senate Clerks |