Senate | 05/03/2018 | Adopted, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/01/2018 | File Number 661 | ||
Senate | 05/01/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/07/18 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 05/01/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/01/2018 | Unfavorable Report, Rejected by the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/01/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/19/2018 | File Number 620 | ||
Senate | 04/19/2018 | Senate Calendar Number 353 | ||
Senate | 04/19/2018 | Unfavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/18/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office - Unfavorable | ||
Senate | 04/17/2018 | Motion Failed (SF) | ||
Senate | 04/13/2018 | Public Hearing 04/17 | ||
Senate | 04/12/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/09/2018 | Filed with Senate Clerks |