House | 04/17/2019 | File Number 666 | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | House Calendar Number 402 | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/01/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/22/2019 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
House | 02/21/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 02/20/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2019 | Vote to Draft |