House | 06/28/2019 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/17/2019 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/17/2019 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/12/2019 | Public Act 19-36 | ||
House | 06/04/2019 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/04/2019 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/24/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 606 | ||
House | 05/24/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/22/2019 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | File Number 79 | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | House Calendar Number 69 | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/15/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/08/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/08/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/22/2019 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
House | 02/21/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 02/20/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 01/16/2019 | Vote to Draft |