House | 05/17/2019 | File Number 909 | ||
House | 05/17/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 520 | ||
House | 05/17/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/15/2019 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B | ||
House | 05/15/2019 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 8730 | ||
House | 05/15/2019 | Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule A 8694 | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | File Number 608 | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | House Calendar Number 362 | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/22/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/05/2019 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/15/2019 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
House | 01/31/2019 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |