House | 05/28/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 614 | ||
House | 05/28/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/23/2019 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | File Number 171 | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | House Calendar Number 121 | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/12/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/08/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/22/2019 | Public Hearing 03/01 | ||
House | 02/21/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | ||
House | 02/20/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/11/2019 | Vote to Draft |