House | 03/19/2019 | File Number 60 | ||
House | 03/19/2019 | House Calendar Number 53 | ||
House | 03/19/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/19/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/12/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/07/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/06/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/11/2019 | Public Hearing 02/15 | ||
House | 02/07/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 02/06/2019 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/06/2019 | Drafted by Committee |