House | 05/31/2019 | File Number 1019 | ||
House | 05/31/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 655 | ||
House | 05/31/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/29/2019 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/29/2019 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9218 | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | File Number 82 | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | House Calendar Number 72 | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/15/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/05/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/01/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/07/2019 | Public Hearing 02/11 | ||
House | 02/06/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 02/05/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2019 | Vote to Draft |