House | 04/26/2019 | File Number 813 | ||
House | 04/26/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 426 | ||
House | 04/26/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7364 | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | File Number 272 | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | House Calendar Number 178 | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/18/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/14/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/08/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | ||
House | 03/07/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2019 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/07/2019 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
House | 01/31/2019 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |