House | 06/21/2019 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/17/2019 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/17/2019 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/12/2019 | Public Act 19-38 | ||
House | 06/04/2019 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/04/2019 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 504 | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | File Number 772 | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | House Calendar Number 480 | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/29/2019 | Public Hearing 04/03 | ||
House | 03/11/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/08/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2019 | Vote to Draft |