6 | 4 | | |
---|
7 | 5 | | General Assembly Committee Bill No. 5526 |
---|
8 | 6 | | January Session, 2019 |
---|
9 | 7 | | LCO No. 3929 |
---|
10 | 8 | | |
---|
11 | 9 | | |
---|
12 | 10 | | Referred to Committee on JUDICIARY |
---|
13 | 11 | | |
---|
14 | 12 | | |
---|
15 | 13 | | Introduced by: |
---|
16 | 14 | | (JUD) |
---|
17 | 15 | | |
---|
18 | 16 | | |
---|
19 | 17 | | |
---|
20 | 18 | | AN ACT CONCERNING GO OD TIME CREDITS AND THE EARNED |
---|
21 | 19 | | RISK REDUCTION CREDI T PROGRAM. |
---|
22 | 20 | | Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General |
---|
23 | 21 | | Assembly convened: |
---|
24 | 22 | | |
---|
25 | 23 | | Section 1. Section 18-7a of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 |
---|
26 | 24 | | following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from passage): 2 |
---|
27 | 25 | | (a) Except as provided in subsections (b) [and (c)] to (d), inclusive, 3 |
---|
28 | 26 | | of this section, any person sentenced to a term of imprisonment, on 4 |
---|
29 | 27 | | and after October 1, 1976, and while still serving such sentence 5 |
---|
30 | 28 | | whether such sentence is for a definite, indefinite or indeterminate 6 |
---|
31 | 29 | | term, and regardless of the institution wherein the prisoner is confined 7 |
---|
32 | 30 | | may, by good conduct and obedience to the rules which have been 8 |
---|
33 | 31 | | established for the service of his sentence, earn a commutation or 9 |
---|
34 | 32 | | diminution of his sentence in the amount of ten days for each month, 10 |
---|
35 | 33 | | and pro rata for a part of a month, of a sentence which is for not more 11 |
---|
36 | 34 | | than five years, and fifteen days for each month, and pro rata for a part 12 |
---|
37 | 35 | | of a month, for the sixth and each subsequent year of a sentence of 13 |
---|
38 | 36 | | more than five years. In the case of an indeterminate sentence, such 14 |
---|
39 | 37 | | credit shall apply to both the minimum and maximum term. In the 15 |
---|
46 | 43 | | |
---|
47 | 44 | | term only. Any act of misconduct or refusal to obey the rules which 17 |
---|
48 | 45 | | have been established for the service of his sentence shall subject the 18 |
---|
49 | 46 | | prisoner to the loss of all or any portion of such credit by the 19 |
---|
50 | 47 | | commissioner or his designee. 20 |
---|
51 | 48 | | (b) Except as provided in [subsection (c)] subsections (c) and (d) of 21 |
---|
52 | 49 | | this section, any person sentenced to a term of imprisonment for an 22 |
---|
53 | 50 | | offense committed on or after July 1, 1981, may, while held in default 23 |
---|
54 | 51 | | of bond or while serving such sentence, by good conduct and 24 |
---|
55 | 52 | | obedience to the rules which have been established for the service of 25 |
---|
56 | 53 | | his sentence, earn a reduction of his sentence in the amount of ten days 26 |
---|
57 | 54 | | for each month and pro rata for a part of a month of a sentence up to 27 |
---|
58 | 55 | | five years, and twelve days for each month and pro rata for a part of a 28 |
---|
59 | 56 | | month for the sixth and each subsequent year of a sentence which is 29 |
---|
60 | 57 | | more than five years. Misconduct or refusal to obey the rules which 30 |
---|
61 | 58 | | have been established for the service of his sentence shall subject the 31 |
---|
62 | 59 | | prisoner to the loss of all or any portion of such reduction by the 32 |
---|
63 | 60 | | commissioner or his designee. 33 |
---|
64 | 61 | | (c) [Any] Except as provided in subsection (d) of this section, any 34 |
---|
65 | 62 | | person sentenced to a term of imprisonment for an offense committed 35 |
---|
66 | 63 | | on or after July 1, 1983, may, while held in default of bond or while 36 |
---|
67 | 64 | | serving such sentence, by good conduct and obedience to the rules 37 |
---|
68 | 65 | | which have been established for the service of his sentence, earn a 38 |
---|
69 | 66 | | reduction of his sentence as such sentence is served in the amount of 39 |
---|
70 | 67 | | ten days for each month served and pro rata for a part of a month 40 |
---|
71 | 68 | | served of a sentence up to five years, and twelve days for each month 41 |
---|
72 | 69 | | served and pro rata for a part of a month served for the sixth and each 42 |
---|
73 | 70 | | subsequent year of a sentence which is more than five years. 43 |
---|
74 | 71 | | Misconduct or refusal to obey the rules which have been established 44 |
---|
75 | 72 | | for the service of his sentence shall subject the prisoner to the loss of all 45 |
---|
76 | 73 | | or any portion of such reduction by the commissioner or his designee. 46 |
---|
77 | 74 | | In the event a prisoner has not yet earned sufficient good time to 47 |
---|
78 | 75 | | satisfy the good time loss, such lost good time shall be deducted from 48 |
---|
85 | 81 | | |
---|
86 | 82 | | (d) On and after the effective date of this section, no person may 50 |
---|
87 | 83 | | earn good time pursuant to this section. Any person who, prior to the 51 |
---|
88 | 84 | | effective date of this section, was eligible to earn good time pursuant to 52 |
---|
89 | 85 | | the provisions of this section, may, on or after the effective date of this 53 |
---|
90 | 86 | | section, earn credits pursuant to the provisions of section 18-98e, as 54 |
---|
91 | 87 | | amended by this act, provided such person is otherwise eligible to earn 55 |
---|
92 | 88 | | such credits. Any good time credits earned prior to the effective date of 56 |
---|
93 | 89 | | this section may be used to reduce a person's sentence in accordance 57 |
---|
94 | 90 | | with subsection (a), (b) or (c) of this section, as applicable, except as 58 |
---|
95 | 91 | | may be lost pursuant to the provisions of this section. Nothing in this 59 |
---|
96 | 92 | | subsection shall invalidate the release or parole release of any person 60 |
---|
97 | 93 | | pursuant to a sentence reduction earned prior to the effective date of 61 |
---|
98 | 94 | | this section. 62 |
---|
99 | 95 | | Sec. 2. Subsection (a) of section 18-98e of the general statutes is 63 |
---|
100 | 96 | | repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from 64 |
---|
101 | 97 | | passage): 65 |
---|
102 | 98 | | (a) Notwithstanding any provision of the general statutes, any 66 |
---|
103 | 99 | | person sentenced to a term of imprisonment [for a crime committed on 67 |
---|
104 | 100 | | or after October 1, 1994,] and committed to the custody of the 68 |
---|
105 | 101 | | Commissioner of Correction, [on or after said date,] except a person 69 |
---|
106 | 102 | | sentenced for a violation of section 53a-54a, 53a-54b, 53a-54c, 53a-54d, 70 |
---|
107 | 103 | | 53a-55, 53a-55a, 53a-70a, 53a-70c or 53a-100aa, or who is a persistent 71 |
---|
108 | 104 | | dangerous felony offender or persistent dangerous sexual offender 72 |
---|
109 | 105 | | pursuant to section 53a-40, may be eligible to earn risk reduction credit 73 |
---|
110 | 106 | | toward a reduction of such person's sentence, in an amount not to 74 |
---|
111 | 107 | | exceed five days per month, at the discretion of the Commissioner of 75 |
---|
112 | 108 | | Correction for conduct as provided in subsection (b) of this section 76 |
---|
113 | 109 | | occurring on or after April 1, 2006. 77 |
---|
114 | 110 | | This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following |
---|
115 | 111 | | sections: |
---|
116 | 112 | | |
---|
117 | 113 | | Section 1 from passage 18-7a |
---|
| 126 | + | [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, |
---|
| 127 | + | except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is |
---|
| 128 | + | not underlined.] |
---|
| 129 | + | |
---|
| 130 | + | Co-Sponsors: REP. KLARIDES, 114th Dist.; REP. CANDELORA, 86th Dist. |
---|
| 131 | + | REP. O'DEA, 125th Dist.; REP. O'NEILL, 69th Dist. |
---|
| 132 | + | REP. KOKORUDA, 101st Dist.; REP. ZUPKUS, 89th Dist. |
---|
| 133 | + | REP. FISHBEIN, 90th Dist.; REP. FRANCE, 42nd Dist. |
---|
| 134 | + | |
---|
| 135 | + | H.B. 5526 |
---|