House | 03/21/2019 | File Number 83 | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | House Calendar Number 73 | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/15/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/08/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/08/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/01/2019 | Public Hearing 03/06 | ||
House | 02/21/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 02/20/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 01/30/2019 | Vote to Draft |