House | 04/22/2019 | No Action | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | File Number 141 | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | House Calendar Number 106 | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/20/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/13/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/12/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/28/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs | ||
House | 02/27/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/19/2019 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/08/2019 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
House | 01/24/2019 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |