Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | 1 | ||
2 | 2 | ||
3 | - | LCO \\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2019HB-05682-R02- | |
4 | - | HB.docx | |
5 | - | 1 of 2 | |
6 | 3 | ||
7 | - | General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 5682 | |
4 | + | LCO No. 5015 1 of 2 | |
5 | + | ||
6 | + | General Assembly Committee Bill No. 5682 | |
8 | 7 | January Session, 2019 | |
8 | + | LCO No. 5015 | |
9 | 9 | ||
10 | 10 | ||
11 | + | Referred to Committee on COMMITTEE ON CHILDREN | |
12 | + | ||
13 | + | ||
14 | + | Introduced by: | |
15 | + | (KID) | |
11 | 16 | ||
12 | 17 | ||
13 | 18 | ||
14 | 19 | AN ACT CONCERNING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FOR POST- | |
15 | 20 | SECONDARY EDUCATION EXPENSES FOR CERTAIN INDIVIDUALS | |
16 | 21 | ADOPTED THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF CHILDR EN AND | |
17 | 22 | FAMILIES FOSTER CARE PROGRAM. | |
18 | 23 | Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General | |
19 | 24 | Assembly convened: | |
20 | 25 | ||
21 | 26 | Section 1. (Effective July 1, 2019) Not later than October 1, 2019, the 1 | |
22 | - | Commissioner of Children and Families shall amend | |
23 | - | ||
24 | - | concerning financial assistance for post-secondary education expenses | |
27 | + | Commissioner of Children and Families shall amend Department of 2 | |
28 | + | Children and Families policy 25-2, effective January 2, 2019, 3 | |
29 | + | concerning financial assistance for post-secondary education expenses 4 | |
25 | 30 | by expanding the eligibility criteria to receive such assistance to 5 | |
26 | 31 | include any individual adopted through the department's foster care 6 | |
27 | - | program during the period beginning January 1, 2001, and ending 7 | |
28 | - | December 31, 2004, provided (1) such individual meets all other 8 | |
29 | - | eligibility requirements of such policy, and (2) any such assistance to 9 | |
30 | - | such individual shall not exceed such individual's demonstrated 10 | |
31 | - | financial need, as determined by the Federal Student Aid Office of the 11 | |
32 | - | United States Department of Education. 12 | |
32 | + | program on or after January 1, 2001, provided such individual meets 7 | |
33 | + | all other eligibility requirements of such policy. 8 | |
33 | 34 | This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following | |
34 | 35 | sections: | |
35 | 36 | ||
36 | 37 | Section 1 July 1, 2019 New section | |
37 | 38 | ||
38 | - | Statement of Legislative Commissioners: | |
39 | - | Subdivision (2) was reworded for clarity. Substitute Bill No. 5682 | |
39 | + | Committee Bill No. 5682 | |
40 | 40 | ||
41 | 41 | ||
42 | - | LCO {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2019HB-05682- | |
43 | - | R02-HB.docx } | |
44 | - | 2 of 2 | |
42 | + | LCO No. 5015 2 of 2 | |
45 | 43 | ||
44 | + | Statement of Purpose: | |
45 | + | To require the Commissioner of Children and Families to amend the | |
46 | + | policy of the Department of Children and Families concerning | |
47 | + | financial assistance for post-secondary education expenses by | |
48 | + | expanding the provision of such assistance to any individual adopted | |
49 | + | through the department on or after January 1, 2001. | |
50 | + | [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, | |
51 | + | except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is | |
52 | + | not underlined.] | |
46 | 53 | ||
47 | - | KID Joint Favorable Subst. | |
54 | + | Co-Sponsors: REP. PETIT, 22nd Dist.; REP. WINKLER, 56th Dist. | |
55 | + | REP. YACCARINO, 87th Dist.; SEN. FASANO, 34th Dist. | |
56 | + | ||
57 | + | H.B. 5682 | |
58 | + | ||
48 | 59 |