House | 05/20/2019 | File Number 932 | ||
House | 05/20/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 532 | ||
House | 05/20/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8793 | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | File Number 650 | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | House Calendar Number 395 | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/19 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/01/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/29/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/22/2019 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
House | 02/21/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 02/20/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2019 | Vote to Draft |