LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2019 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB05870
Action History
CT
Connecticut House Bill HB05870
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2019 Regular Session
Connecticut House Bill HB05870
Action History
House
03/20/2019
Motion Failed (JF)
House
03/04/2019
Public Hearing 03/11
House
02/26/2019
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
House
02/25/2019
Drafted by Committee
House
02/01/2019
Vote to Draft