House | 03/25/2019 | File Number 115 | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | House Calendar Number 93 | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/08/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/07/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/22/2019 | Public Hearing 02/28 | ||
House | 02/21/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children | ||
House | 02/20/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2019 | Vote to Draft |