Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 663
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2019
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10394
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2019
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2019
|
File Number 396
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2019
|
House Calendar Number 249
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2019
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2019
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2019
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2019
|
Public Hearing 02/14
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2019
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|