Connecticut 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06172 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11
22
3-LCO \\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2019HB-06172-R01-
4-HB.docx
5-1 of 3
3+LCO No. 1738 1 of 3
64
7-General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 6172
5+General Assembly Raised Bill No. 6172
86 January Session, 2019
7+LCO No. 1738
98
9+
10+Referred to Committee on AGING
11+
12+
13+Introduced by:
14+(AGE)
1015
1116
1217
1318
1419 AN ACT REDUCING PART ICIPANT COSTS AND EXPANDING
1520 ELIGIBILITY FOR THE CONNECTICUT HOME -CARE PROGRAM FOR
1621 THE ELDERLY.
1722 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General
1823 Assembly convened:
1924
2025 Section 1. Subsection (i) of section 17b-342 of the general statutes is 1
2126 repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 2
2227 1, 2019): 3
2328 (i) (1) [On and after July 1, 2015, the] The Commissioner of Social 4
2429 Services shall, within available appropriations, administer a state-5
2530 funded portion of the program for persons (A) who are sixty-five years 6
2631 of age and older; (B) who are inappropriately institutionalized or at 7
2732 risk of inappropriate institutionalization; (C) whose income is less than 8
2833 or equal to the amount allowed under subdivision (3) of subsection (a) 9
2934 of this section; and (D) whose assets, if single, do not exceed [one 10
3035 hundred fifty per cent of the federal minimum community spouse 11
3136 protected amount pursuant to 42 USC 1396r-5(f)(2) or, if married, the 12
3237 couple's assets do not exceed two hundred per cent of said community 13
33-spouse protected amount] forty thousand dollars or, if a married couple, 14
34-sixty-five thousand dollars. For program applications received by the 15
38+spouse protected amount] forty thousand dollars or, if married, sixty-14 Raised Bill No. 6172
39+
40+
41+
42+LCO No. 1738 2 of 3
43+
44+five thousand dollars. For program applications received by the 15
3545 Department of Social Services for the fiscal years ending June 30, 2016, 16
3646 and June 30, 2017, only persons who require the level of care provided 17
37-in a nursing home shall be eligible for the state-funded portion of the 18 Substitute Bill No. 6172
38-
39-
40-LCO {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2019HB-06172-
41-R01-HB.docx }
42-2 of 3
43-
47+in a nursing home shall be eligible for the state-funded portion of the 18
4448 program, except for persons residing in affordable housing under the 19
4549 assisted living demonstration project established pursuant to section 20
4650 17b-347e who are otherwise eligible in accordance with this section. 21
4751 (2) Except for persons residing in affordable housing under the 22
4852 assisted living demonstration project established pursuant to section 23
4953 17b-347e, as provided in subdivision (3) of this subsection, any person 24
5054 whose income is at or below two hundred per cent of the federal 25
5155 poverty level and who is ineligible for Medicaid shall contribute [nine] 26
5256 seven per cent of the cost of his or her care. Any person whose income 27
5357 exceeds two hundred per cent of the federal poverty level shall 28
5458 contribute [nine] seven per cent of the cost of his or her care in 29
5559 addition to the amount of applied income determined in accordance 30
5660 with the methodology established by the Department of Social Services 31
5761 for recipients of medical assistance. Any person who does not 32
5862 contribute to the cost of care in accordance with this subdivision shall 33
5963 be ineligible to receive services under this subsection. Notwithstanding 34
6064 any provision of sections 17b-60 and 17b-61, the department shall not 35
6165 be required to provide an administrative hearing to a person found 36
6266 ineligible for services under this [subsection] subdivision because of a 37
6367 failure to contribute to the cost of care. 38
6468 (3) Any person who resides in affordable housing under the assisted 39
6569 living demonstration project established pursuant to section 17b-347e 40
6670 and whose income is at or below two hundred per cent of the federal 41
6771 poverty level, shall not be required to contribute to the cost of care. 42
6872 Any person who resides in affordable housing under the assisted 43
6973 living demonstration project established pursuant to section 17b-347e 44
7074 and whose income exceeds two hundred per cent of the federal 45
7175 poverty level, shall contribute to the applied income amount 46
7276 determined in accordance with the methodology established by the 47
73-Department of Social Services for recipients of medical assistance. Any 48
77+Department of Social Services for recipients of medical assistance. Any 48 Raised Bill No. 6172
78+
79+
80+
81+LCO No. 1738 3 of 3
82+
7483 person whose income exceeds two hundred per cent of the federal 49
7584 poverty level and who does not contribute to the cost of care in 50
76-accordance with this subdivision shall be ineligible to receive services 51 Substitute Bill No. 6172
77-
78-
79-LCO {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2019HB-06172-
80-R01-HB.docx }
81-3 of 3
82-
85+accordance with this subdivision shall be ineligible to receive services 51
8386 under this subsection. Notwithstanding any provision of sections 17b-52
8487 60 and 17b-61, the department shall not be required to provide an 53
8588 administrative hearing to a person found ineligible for services under 54
8689 this [subsection] subdivision because of a failure to contribute to the 55
8790 cost of care. 56
8891 (4) The annualized cost of services provided to an individual under 57
8992 the state-funded portion of the program shall not exceed fifty per cent 58
9093 of the weighted average cost of care in nursing homes in the state, 59
9194 except an individual who received services costing in excess of such 60
9295 amount under the Department of Social Services in the fiscal year 61
9396 ending June 30, 1992, may continue to receive such services, provided 62
9497 the annualized cost of such services does not exceed eighty per cent of 63
9598 the weighted average cost of such nursing home care. The 64
9699 commissioner may allow the cost of services provided to an individual 65
97100 to exceed the maximum cost established pursuant to this subdivision 66
98101 in a case of extreme hardship, as determined by the commissioner, 67
99102 provided in no case shall such cost exceed that of the weighted cost of 68
100103 such nursing home care. 69
101104 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following
102105 sections:
103106
104107 Section 1 July 1, 2019 17b-342(i)
105108
106-Statement of Legislative Commissioners:
107-In section 1(i)(1)(D), "if married" was changed to "if a married couple"
108-for clarity.
109-
110-AGE Joint Favorable Subst. -LCO
109+Statement of Purpose:
110+To expand eligibility for the state-funded portion of the Connecticut
111+home-care program for the elderly and reduce participant costs.
112+[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline,
113+except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is
114+not underlined.]
111115