House | 02/14/2019 | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 02/14/2019 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 02/13/2019 | Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
House | 02/06/2019 | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 02/06/2019 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 02/05/2019 | Change of Reference Planning and Development | ||
House | 01/25/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |