House | 04/10/2019 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | File Number 282 | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | House Calendar Number 188 | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/18/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/14/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/11/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | ||
House | 03/08/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2019 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
House | 01/31/2019 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |