LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2019 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB06476
Action History
CT
Connecticut House Bill HB06476
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2019 Regular Session
Connecticut House Bill HB06476
Action History
House
03/06/2019
Referred to Joint Committee on Housing
House
03/05/2019
Drafted by Committee
House
02/19/2019
Vote to Draft
House
02/08/2019
Public Hearing 02/14
House
02/05/2019
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing