House | 04/01/2019 | File Number 243 | ||
House | 04/01/2019 | House Calendar Number 161 | ||
House | 04/01/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/01/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/15/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/14/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/08/2019 | Public Hearing 03/12 | ||
House | 03/07/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce | ||
House | 03/06/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2019 | Vote to Draft |