Senate | 06/05/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 693 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 06/05/2019 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 06/05/2019 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 06/05/2019 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9918 | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | File Number 886 | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | House Calendar Number 593 | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/15/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/30/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/30/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/08/2019 | Public Hearing 02/13 | ||
House | 02/06/2019 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |