House | 03/04/2019 | Public Hearing 03/08 | ||
House | 02/22/2019 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
House | 02/13/2019 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing | ||
House | 02/08/2019 | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 02/08/2019 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 02/07/2019 | Change of Reference Planning and Development | ||
House | 01/29/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |