House
|
05/16/2019
|
File Number 904
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 495
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8675
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
No New File by Committee on Housing
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Referred by House to Committee on Housing
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2019
|
File Number 573
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2019
|
House Calendar Number 346
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2019
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2019
|
Public Hearing 03/06
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2019
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2019
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|