House | 04/17/2019 | No Action | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 03/19/2019 | File Number 63 | ||
House | 03/19/2019 | House Calendar Number 56 | ||
House | 03/19/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/19/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/12/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/07/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/06/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/22/2019 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
House | 02/21/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 02/20/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2019 | Vote to Draft |