House
|
06/21/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2019
|
Special Act 19-10
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
File Number 990
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 605
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9426
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
File Number 475
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
House Calendar Number 300
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2019
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2019
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2019
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2019
|
Public Hearing 02/26
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2019
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|