House | 05/01/2019 | File Number 860 | ||
House | 05/01/2019 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/01/2019 | New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 05/01/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/30/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/22/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 04/03/2019 | File Number 339 | ||
House | 04/03/2019 | House Calendar Number 217 | ||
House | 04/03/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/14/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/01/2019 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
House | 02/26/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
House | 02/25/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2019 | Vote to Draft |