House | 03/28/2019 | File Number 190 | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | House Calendar Number 140 | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/12/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/07/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/08/2019 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
House | 02/04/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |