House | 05/31/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 642 | ||
House | 05/31/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/29/2019 | House Passed | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | File Number 143 | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | House Calendar Number 108 | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/20/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/08/2019 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
House | 02/04/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |