House | 05/20/2019 | File Number 936 | ||
House | 05/20/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 542 | ||
House | 05/20/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 8932 | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 8937 | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8919 | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | File Number 753 | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | House Calendar Number 451 | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/12/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/29/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/07/2019 | Public Hearing 02/11 | ||
House | 02/05/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |