Connecticut 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB07072 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 03/07/2019

                             
 
LCO 3349  \\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2019HB-07072-R01-
HB.docx  
1 of 4 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 7072  
January Session, 2019  
LCO No. 3349 
 
 
Referred to Committee on AGING  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(AGE)  
 
 
 
AN ACT INCREASING FUNDING F OR ELDERLY NUTRITION 
SERVICES.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Subsection (a) of section 17b-242 of the general statutes is 1 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 2 
1, 2019): 3 
(a) The Department of Social Services shall determine the rates to be 4 
paid to home health care agencies and homemaker-home health aide 5 
agencies by the state or any town in the state for persons aided or 6 
cared for by the state or any such town. [For the period from February 7 
1, 1991, to January 31, 1992, inclusive, payment for each service to the 8 
state shall be based upon the rate for such service as determined by the 9 
Office of Health Care Access, except that for those providers whose 10 
Medicaid rates for the year ending January 31, 1991, exceed the median 11 
rate, no increase shall be allowed. For those providers whose rates for 12 
the year ending January 31, 1991, are below the median rate, increases 13 
shall not exceed the lower of the prior rate increased by the most 14 
recent annual increase in the consumer price index for urban 15 
consumers or the median rate. In no case shall any such rate exceed the 16  Raised Bill No. 7072 
 
 
LCO 3349  {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2019HB-07072-
R01-HB.docx }   
2 of 4 
 
eightieth percentile of rates in effect January 31, 1991, nor shall any rate 17 
exceed the charge to the general public for similar services. Rates 18 
effective February 1, 1992, shall be based upon rates as determined by 19 
the Office of Health Care Access, except that increases shall not exceed 20 
the prior year's rate increased by the most recent annual increase in the 21 
consumer price index for urban consumers and rates effective 22 
February 1, 1992, shall remain in effect through June 30, 1993. Rates 23 
effective July 1, 1993, shall be based upon rates as determined by the 24 
Office of Health Care Access except if the Medicaid rates for any 25 
service for the period ending June 30, 1993, exceed the median rate for 26 
such service, the increase effective July 1, 1993, shall not exceed one 27 
per cent. If the Medicaid rate for any service for the period ending June 28 
30, 1993, is below the median rate, the increase effective July 1, 1993, 29 
shall not exceed the lower of the prior rate increased by one and one-30 
half times the most recent annual increase in the consumer price index 31 
for urban consumers or the median rate plus one per cent.] The 32 
Commissioner of Social Services shall establish a fee schedule for home 33 
health services to be effective on and after July 1, 1994. The 34 
commissioner may annually modify such fee schedule if such 35 
modification is needed to ensure that the conversion to an 36 
administrative services organization is cost neutral to home health care 37 
agencies and homemaker-home health aide agencies in the aggregate 38 
and ensures patient access. Utilization may be a factor in determining 39 
cost neutrality. The commissioner shall increase the fee schedule for 40 
home health services provided under the Connecticut home-care 41 
program for the elderly established under section 17b-342, effective 42 
July 1, 2000, by two per cent over the fee schedule for home health 43 
services for the previous year. Effective July 1, 2019, the commissioner 44 
shall increase the fee schedule for meals on wheels provided under the 45 
Connecticut home-care program for the elderly by ten per cent over the 46 
fee schedule for meals on wheels for the previous fiscal year. The 47 
commissioner may increase any fee payable to a home health care 48 
agency or homemaker-home health aide agency upon the application 49 
of such an agency evidencing extraordinary costs related to (1) serving 50 
persons with AIDS; (2) high-risk maternal and child health care; (3) 51  Raised Bill No. 7072 
 
 
LCO 3349  {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2019HB-07072-
R01-HB.docx }   
3 of 4 
 
escort services; or (4) extended hour services. In no case shall any rate 52 
or fee exceed the charge to the general public for similar services. A 53 
home health care agency or homemaker-home health aide agency 54 
which, due to any material change in circumstances, is aggrieved by a 55 
rate determined pursuant to this subsection may, within ten days of 56 
receipt of written notice of such rate from the Commissioner of Social 57 
Services, request in writing a hearing on all items of aggrievement. The 58 
commissioner shall, upon the receipt of all documentation necessary to 59 
evaluate the request, determine whether there has been such a change 60 
in circumstances and shall conduct a hearing if appropriate. The 61 
Commissioner of Social Services shall adopt regulations, in accordance 62 
with chapter 54, to implement the provisions of this subsection. The 63 
commissioner may implement policies and procedures to carry out the 64 
provisions of this subsection while in the process of adopting 65 
regulations, provided notice of intent to adopt the regulations is 66 
[published in the Connecticut Law Journal] posted on the Internet web 67 
site of the Department of Social Services and the eRegulations System not 68 
later than twenty days after the date of implementing the policies and 69 
procedures. Such policies and procedures shall be valid for not longer 70 
than nine months. 71 
Sec. 2. Section 17b-343 of the general statutes is repealed and the 72 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2019): 73 
The Commissioner of Social Services shall establish annually the 74 
maximum allowable rate to be paid by agencies for homemaker 75 
services, chore person services, companion services, respite care, meals 76 
on wheels, adult day care services, case management and assessment 77 
services, transportation, mental health counseling and elderly foster 78 
care. [, except that the maximum allowable rates in effect July 1, 1990, 79 
shall remain in effect during the fiscal years ending June 30, 1992, and 80 
June 30, 1993.] The Commissioner of Social Services shall prescribe 81 
uniform forms on which agencies providing such services shall report 82 
their costs for such services. Such rates shall be determined on the 83 
basis of a reasonable payment for necessary services rendered. The 84  Raised Bill No. 7072 
 
 
LCO 3349  {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2019HB-07072-
R01-HB.docx }   
4 of 4 
 
maximum allowable rates established by the Commissioner of Social 85 
Services for the Connecticut home-care program for the elderly 86 
established under section 17b-342 shall constitute the rates required 87 
under this section until revised in accordance with this section. The 88 
Commissioner of Social Services shall establish a fee schedule, to be 89 
effective on and after July 1, 1994, for homemaker services, chore 90 
person services, companion services, respite care, meals on wheels, 91 
adult day care services, case management and assessment services, 92 
transportation, mental health counseling and elderly foster care. The 93 
commissioner may annually increase [any fee in] the fee schedule 94 
based on an increase in the cost of services. The commissioner shall 95 
increase the fee schedule effective July 1, 2000, by not less than five per 96 
cent, for adult day care services. The commissioner shall increase the 97 
fee schedule effective July 1, 2011, by four dollars per person, per day 98 
for adult day care services. The commissioner shall increase the fee 99 
schedule effective July 1, 2019, for meals on wheels provided under the 100 
Connecticut home-care program for the elderly by ten per cent over the 101 
fee schedule for meals on wheels for the previous fiscal year. Nothing 102 
contained in this section shall authorize a payment by the state to any 103 
agency for such services in excess of the amount charged by such 104 
agency for such services to the general public.  105 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2019 17b-242(a) 
Sec. 2 July 1, 2019 17b-343 
 
AGE Joint Favorable