House | 07/09/2019 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/27/2019 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/27/2019 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/24/2019 | Public Act 19-136 | ||
House | 06/05/2019 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/05/2019 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 06/05/2019 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 04/26/2019 | File Number 816 | ||
House | 04/26/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 424 | ||
House | 04/26/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7489 | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | File Number 88 | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | House Calendar Number 78 | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/15/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/07/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/06/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/22/2019 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
House | 02/21/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 02/20/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2019 | Vote to Draft |