Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 684
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10914
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
File Number 888
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/15/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2019
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2019
|
File Number 33
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2019
|
House Calendar Number 40
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2019
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2019
|
Public Hearing 02/19
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Aging
|
|
|