Connecticut 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB07119 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/14/2019

                             
 
LCO    \\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2019HB-07119-R02-
HB.docx  
1 of 4 
 
General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 7119  
January Session, 2019 
 
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING ST UDENT TRUSTEES AND T HE ELECTION 
OF ALUMNI TO THE BOA RD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF 
CONNECTICUT.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 10a-103 of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2019): 2 
(a) There shall continue to be a Board of Trustees for The University 3 
of Connecticut to consist of [twenty-one] twenty-three persons, twelve 4 
to be appointed by the Governor, who shall reflect the state's 5 
geographic, racial and ethnic diversity; two to be elected by the 6 
university alumni; [two] four to be elected by the students enrolled at 7 
the institutions under the jurisdiction of said board; and five members 8 
ex officio.  9 
(b) On or before July 1, 1983, the Governor shall appoint [members] 10 
trustees to the board as follows: Four [members] trustees for a term of 11 
two years from said date; four [members] trustees for a term of four 12 
years from said date; and four [members] trustees for a term of six 13 
years from said date. Thereafter, the Governor shall appoint trustees of 14 
said university to succeed those appointees whose terms expire, and 15 
each trustee so appointed shall hold office for a period of six years 16 
from the first day of July in the year of his or her appointment, 17 
provided two of the trustees appointed for terms commencing July 1, 18  Substitute Bill No. 7119 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2019HB-07119-
R02-HB.docx }   
2 of 4 
 
1995, and their successors shall be alumni of the university, one of the 19 
trustees appointed for a term commencing July 1, 1997, and his or her 20 
successors shall be such alumni and one of the members appointed for 21 
a term commencing July 1, 1999, and his or her successors shall be such 22 
alumni.  23 
(c) The Commissioner of Agriculture, the Commissio ner of 24 
Education, the Commissioner of Economic and Community 25 
Development and the chairperson of The University of Connecticut 26 
Health Center Board of Directors shall be, ex officio, members of the 27 
board of trustees. The Governor shall be, ex officio, president of said 28 
board.  29 
(d) The graduates of all of the schools and colleges of said university 30 
shall, prior to September first in the odd-numbered years, elect one 31 
trustee, who shall be a graduate of the institution and who shall hold 32 
office for four years from the first day of September succeeding his or 33 
her election. Not less than two or more than four nominations for each 34 
such election shall be made by the alumni association of said 35 
university, provided no person who has served as an alumni trustee 36 
for the two full consecutive terms immediately prior to the term for 37 
which such election is to be held shall be nominated for any such 38 
election. Such election shall be conducted [by mail] prior to September 39 
first under the supervision of a canvassing board consisting of three 40 
members, one appointed by the board of trustees, one by the board of 41 
directors of the alumni association of the university and one by the 42 
president of the university. No ballot in such election, whether in 43 
paper or electronic form, shall be opened until the date by which 44 
ballots must be returned to the canvassing board. In such election, all 45 
graduates shall be entitled to vote by signed paper or electronic ballots. 46 
[which have been circulated to them by mail and which shall be 47 
returned by mail.] Vacancies occurring by death or resignation of 48 
either of such alumni trustees shall be filled for the unexpired portion 49 
of the term by special election, if such unexpired term is for more than 50 
eighteen months. When the unexpired term is eighteen months or less, 51  Substitute Bill No. 7119 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2019HB-07119-
R02-HB.docx }   
3 of 4 
 
such vacancy shall be filled by appointment by the board of directors 52 
of said alumni association.  53 
(e) On or before November 1, 1975, the students of The University of 54 
Connecticut shall, in such manner as the board of trustees of said 55 
university shall determine, elect two trustees, each of whom shall be 56 
enrolled as a full-time student of said university at the time of his or 57 
her election. One such [member] trustee shall be elected for a term of 58 
one year from November 1, 1975, and one for a term of two years from 59 
said date. Prior to July first, annually, until and including the election 60 
held on or before July 1, 2019, such students shall, in accordance with 61 
this section and in such manner as the board shall determine, elect one 62 
[member] trustee of [said] the board, who shall be so enrolled at said 63 
university at the time of his or her election and who shall serve for a 64 
term of two years from July first in the year of his or her election. On or 65 
before July 1, 2020, such students shall, in accordance with this 66 
subsection and in such manner as the board shall determine, elect two 67 
additional trustees, each of whom shall be enrolled as a full-time 68 
student at said university at the time of his or her election. One such 69 
trustee shall be elected for a term of one year commencing July 1, 2020, 70 
and the other trustee shall be elected for a term of two years from said 71 
date. On or before July 1, 2021, and annually thereafter, in accordance 72 
with this subsection and in such manner as the board shall determine, 73 
such students shall elect two trustees of the board who shall be 74 
enrolled as full-time students at said university at the time of their 75 
election and who shall serve for a term of two years from July first in 76 
the year of their election. The student [member] trustee elected to fill 77 
the term expiring on June 30, 2003, and the student trustee elected to 78 
fill the term expiring on June 30, 2022, and such elected [member's] 79 
trustees' successors, shall be enrolled as [a] full-time undergraduate 80 
[student] students at a school or college of the university and shall be 81 
elected by the undergraduate students of the schools and colleges of 82 
the university. The student [member] trustee elected to fill the term 83 
expiring on June 30, 2004, and the student trustee elected to fill the 84 
term expiring on June 30, 2021, and such elected [member's] trustees' 85  Substitute Bill No. 7119 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2019HB-07119-
R02-HB.docx }   
4 of 4 
 
successors, shall be enrolled as [a] full-time [student] students in the 86 
School of Law, the School of Medicine, the School of Dentistry, the 87 
School of Social Work, or as a graduate student of a school or college of 88 
the university, and shall be elected by the students of the School of 89 
Law, the School of Medicine, the School of Dentistry, the School of 90 
Social Work and the graduate students of the schools and colleges of 91 
the university. Any student [member] trustee elected after July 1, 2013, 92 
shall be enrolled as a full-time student at the time of his or her election 93 
and for the duration of his or her term of service. Any vacancies in the 94 
elected membership of [said] the board shall, except as otherwise 95 
provided in subsection (d) of this section, be filled by special election 96 
for the balance of the unexpired term. 97 
(f) On or before July 1, 2020, the board of trustees shall appoint to its 98 
(1) financial affairs committee at least one student member who shall 99 
be one of the undergraduate student trustees elected pursuant to 100 
subsection (e) of this section, and (2) student life committee at least two 101 
student members, one of whom shall be the other undergraduate 102 
student trustee elected pursuant to subsection (e) of this section and 103 
the second of whom shall be an undergraduate student selected by the 104 
undergraduate student government.  105 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 October 1, 2019 10a-103 
 
 
HED Joint Favorable Subst.  
APP Joint Favorable