House
|
07/08/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2019
|
Public Act 19-149
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 574
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2019
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2019
|
File Number 91
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2019
|
House Calendar Number 81
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2019
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2019
|
Public Hearing 02/19
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
|
|
|