Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2019
|
Public Act 19-71
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 486
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8292
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2019
|
File Number 192
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2019
|
House Calendar Number 142
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2019
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2019
|
Public Hearing 02/26
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
|
|
|