Connecticut 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB07162 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/03/2019

                             
 
LCO    \\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2019HB-07162-R01-
HB.docx  
1 of 4 
 
General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 7162  
January Session, 2019 
 
 
 
 
 
AN ACT ESTABLISHING THE CONNECTICUT OPEN EDUCATIONAL 
RESOURCE COORDINATIN G COUNCIL.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2019) (a) For the purposes of this 1 
section: 2 
(1) "Open educational resource" means a college level resource 3 
made available on an Internet web site to be used by students, faculty 4 
and members of the public on an unlimited basis at a cost lower than 5 
the marketing value of the printed textbook or other educational 6 
resource, including full courses, course materials, modules, textbooks, 7 
streaming videos, tests, software and other similar teaching, learning 8 
and research resources that reside in the public domain or have been 9 
released under a creative commons attribution license that permits the 10 
free use and repurposing of such resources; 11 
(2) "Creative commons attribution license" means a copyright 12 
crediting the author of a digital work product that allows for the free 13 
use and distribution of such work product; and 14 
(3) "High-impact course" means a course of instruction for which 15 
open educational resources would make a significant positive financial 16 
impact on the students taking the course due to the number of 17 
students taking the course or the marketing value of the printed 18  Substitute Bill No. 7162 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2019HB-07162-
R01-HB.docx }   
2 of 4 
 
textbook or other educational resources required for such course. 19 
(b) There is established the Connecticut Open Educational Resource 20 
Coordinating Council, which shall be part of the Executive 21 
Department. The executive director of the Office of Higher Education 22 
shall appoint the members of the council which shall consist of the 23 
following: (1) A state-wide coordinator, who shall collaborate with all 24 
institutions of higher education to promote open educational resources 25 
and administer grants; (2) one faculty member, one administrator and 26 
one staff member from The University of Connecticut; (3) one faculty 27 
member, one administrator and one staff member from the regional 28 
community-technical college system; (4) one faculty member, one 29 
administrator and one staff member from Charter Oak State College; 30 
(5) one faculty member, one administrator and one staff member from 31 
the Connecticut State University System; (6) one faculty member, one 32 
administrator and one staff member from the independent institutions 33 
of higher education; and (7) one student from any public or 34 
independent institution of higher education in the state. All initial 35 
appointments to the council shall be made not later than September 1, 36 
2019, and shall expire on August 30, 2022, regardless of when the 37 
initial appointment was made. Any member of the council may serve 38 
more than one term. 39 
(c) The state-wide coordinator appointed by the executive director 40 
of the Office of Higher Education shall serve as the chairperson of the 41 
council. The chairperson shall schedule the first meeting of the council, 42 
which shall be held not later than October 1, 2019. The administrative 43 
staff of the Office of Higher Education shall serve as administrative 44 
staff of the council. 45 
(d) Appointed members of the council shall serve for three-year 46 
terms which shall commence on the date of appointment, except as 47 
provided in subsection (b) of this section. Members shall continue to 48 
serve until their successors are appointed. Any vacancy shall be filled 49 
by the executive director of the Office of Higher Education. Any 50 
vacancy occurring other than by expiration of term shall be filled for 51  Substitute Bill No. 7162 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2019HB-07162-
R01-HB.docx }   
3 of 4 
 
the balance of the unexpired term. A majority of the council shall 52 
constitute a quorum for the transaction of any business. The members 53 
of the council shall serve without compensation, but shall, within the 54 
limits of available funds, be reimbursed for expenses necessarily 55 
incurred in the performance of their duties. 56 
(e) The council shall perform the following functions: 57 
(1) Identify high-impact courses for which open educational 58 
resources will be developed, converted or adopted; 59 
(2) Establish a program of competitive grants for faculty members of 60 
institutions of higher education in the state for the development, 61 
conversion or adoption of open educational resources for high-impact 62 
courses with any funds identified by the council and within available 63 
appropriations; 64 
(3) Accept, review and approve competitive grant applications, 65 
provided any faculty member who is approved for a competitive grant 66 
shall license such open educational resources through a creative 67 
commons attribution license; 68 
(4) Administer a standardized review and approval process for the 69 
development, conversion or adoption of open educational resources; 70 
(5) Establish a state-sponsored digital clearinghouse that shall 71 
function as a publicly accessible database for the collection, storage 72 
and purchase of open educational resources; and 73 
(6) Promote strategies for the production, use and access of open 74 
educational resources. 75 
(f) The council shall meet quarterly, or as often as deemed necessary 76 
by a majority of the council. 77 
(g) Not later than January 1, 2021, and annually thereafter, the 78 
council shall submit a report, in accordance with the provisions of 79  Substitute Bill No. 7162 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2019HB-07162-
R01-HB.docx }   
4 of 4 
 
section 11-4a of the general statutes, to the joint standing committee of 80 
the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to higher 81 
education regarding (1) the number and percentage of high-impact 82 
courses for which open educational resources have been developed, (2) 83 
the degree to which institutions of higher education promote the use 84 
and access to open educational resources through the state-sponsored 85 
digital clearinghouse, (3) the amount of grants awarded by the council 86 
and the number of open educational resources developed by grant 87 
recipients, and (4) its recommendations for any amendments to the 88 
general statutes necessary to develop open educational resources. 89 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2019 New section 
 
HED Joint Favorable Subst.