Senate | 06/03/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 667 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 06/01/2019 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 06/01/2019 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 06/01/2019 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10145 | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | File Number 558 | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | House Calendar Number 340 | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/03/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/22/2019 | Public Hearing 02/28 | ||
House | 02/21/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |