Senate
|
07/12/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2019
|
Public Act 19-193
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 692
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10979
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
File Number 861
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/07/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Referred by House to Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
File Number 688
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
House Calendar Number 424
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2019
|
Public Hearing 03/20
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|