House | 05/10/2019 | Referred by House to Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | File Number 150 | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | House Calendar Number 114 | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/20/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/12/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/08/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/28/2019 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
House | 02/21/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |