Connecticut 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB07198 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 06/25/2019

                             
 
 
Substitute House Bill No. 7198 
 
Public Act No. 19-164 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING SO CIAL WORKERS. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 20-195q of the general statutes is repealed and the 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2019): 
(a) No person shall (1) use the title "licensed master social worker" 
or any initials associated with such title, or (2) advertise services under 
the description of a licensed master social worker, as defined in section 
20-195m, unless such person is licensed as a master social worker 
pursuant to this chapter. 
(b) No person shall (1) use the title "licensed clinical social worker" 
or any initials associated with such title, or (2) advertise services under 
the description of a licensed clinical social worker, as defined in section 
20-195m, unless such person is licensed as a clinical social worker 
pursuant to this chapter. 
(c) No person shall (1) use the title "social worker" or any initials 
associated with such title, or (2) advertise services under the 
description of "social worker", unless such person has earned a 
baccalaureate or master's degree in social work from a social work 
program accredited by the Council on Social Work Education, a  Substitute House Bill No. 7198 
 
Public Act No. 19-164 	2 of 3 
 
doctoral degree in social work or, if educated outside of the United 
States or its territories, has completed an educational program deemed 
equivalent by said council. 
[(c)] (d) Nothing in this chapter shall prohibit: (1) A student enrolled 
in a doctoral or master's degree program accredited by the Council on 
Social Work Education from performing such work as is incidental to 
his course of study, provided such person is designated by a title 
which clearly indicates his status as a student; (2) a person licensed or 
certified in this state in a field other than clinical social work from 
practicing within the scope of such license or certification; (3) a person 
enrolled in an educational program or fulfilling other state 
requirements leading to licensure or certification in a field other than 
social work from engaging in work in such other field; (4) a person 
who is employed or retained as a social work designee, social worker, 
or social work consultant by a nursing home or rest home licensed 
under section 19a-490 and who meets the qualifications prescribed by 
the department in its regulations from performing the duties required 
of them in accordance with state and federal laws governing those 
duties; [(5) for the period from October 1, 2010, to October 1, 2013, 
inclusive, a master social worker from engaging in independent 
practice; (6)] (5) a social worker from practicing community 
organization, policy and planning, research or administration that 
does not include engaging in clinical social work or supervising a 
social worker engaged in clinical treatment with clients; [(7)] (6) 
individuals with a baccalaureate degree in social work from a Council 
on Social Work Education accredited program from performing 
nonclinical social work functions; [and (8)] (7) a person who holds a 
professional educator certificate issued by the State Board of Education 
pursuant to section 10-145b, with a school social worker endorsement, 
from using the title of school social worker to describe such person's 
activities while working in a public or nonpublic school in the state; (8) 
any person employed by a municipality prior to July 1, 2019, under the  Substitute House Bill No. 7198 
 
Public Act No. 19-164 	3 of 3 
 
title social worker from using such title to describe or perform duties 
in the course of such employment with the municipality; and (9) a state 
employee with the title social worker from using such title to describe 
or perform duties in the course of such employment with the state. On 
and after October 1, 2019, the state shall specify on any job posting for 
a title in the social work series of classified service, in which a license 
pursuant to this chapter is not required, that a preferred qualification 
for employment in such title is completion of a baccalaureate or 
master's degree in social work from a social work program accredited 
by the Council on Social Work Education or a doctoral degree in social 
work. 
Sec. 2. Subsection (a) of section 20-195s of the general statutes is 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective 
October 1, 2019): 
(a) An individual licensed as a master social worker pursuant to 
section 20-195n may: (1) Practice clinical social work under 
professional supervision; and (2) offer a mental health diagnosis 
provided such diagnosis is offered in consultation with a physician 
licensed pursuant to chapter 370, an advanced practice registered 
nurse licensed pursuant to chapter 378, a psychologist licensed 
pursuant to chapter 383, a marital and family therapist licensed 
pursuant to chapter 383a, a professional counselor licensed pursuant to 
chapter 383c or a clinical social worker licensed pursuant to this 
chapter. [Except as provided in subsection (c) of section 20-195q, a] A 
licensed master social worker may not engage in independent practice.