House | 05/28/2019 | File Number 1005 | ||
House | 05/28/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 625 | ||
House | 05/28/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/23/2019 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/23/2019 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9552 | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | File Number 691 | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | House Calendar Number 427 | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/01/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/29/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/22/2019 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
House | 02/21/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |